U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cr-00057-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Trujillo
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2020
  • October 26, 2020: [Mail Returned]
  • October 23, 2020: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • October 14, 2020: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • October 07, 2020: [Order on Motion for Compassionate Release (COVID-19)]
September, 2020
  • September 10, 2020: [Reply to Response]
August, 2020
  • August 26, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • August 25, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • August 21, 2020: [Notice of Conventional Filing]
  • August 21, 2020: [Response in Opposition]
  • August 21, 2020: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal or Restricted]
  • August 14, 2020: [Order]
  • August 12, 2020: [Leave to File Document Under Seal or Restricted]
  • August 11, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 10, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • August 10, 2020: [Order]
  • August 10, 2020: [Compassionate Release (COVID-19)]
August, 2019
  • August 15, 2019: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • August 15, 2019: [Trial/Hearing Exhibit]
July, 2019
  • July 23, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • July 23, 2019: [Order on Motion to Unseal Document]
  • July 23, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • July 23, 2019: [Waiver of Preliminary Examination or Hearing]
  • July 23, 2019: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • July 23, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • July 23, 2019: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • July 23, 2019: [Order on Petition for Warrant/Summons (12C)]
October, 2017
  • October 03, 2017: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • October 03, 2017: [Trial/Hearing Exhibit]
  • October 03, 2017: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
September, 2017
  • September 26, 2017: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • September 22, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 21, 2017: [Order on Motion to Unseal Document]
  • September 21, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • September 21, 2017: [Waiver of Preliminary Examination or Hearing]
  • September 21, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • September 21, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • September 21, 2017: [Unseal Document]
  • September 21, 2017: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • September 21, 2017: [Notice of Hearing]
August, 2016
  • August 10, 2016: [Case Inquiry Report]
  • August 08, 2016: [Transfer In/Supervised Release]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.