U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:15-cr-00017-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Lindsey et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2019
  • August 06, 2019: [Order on Petition re: Probation/Supervised Release (12B)]
October, 2018
  • October 01, 2018: [Order]
  • October 01, 2018: [Order on Motion for Writ]
September, 2018
  • September 27, 2018: [Transcript (DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS)]
  • September 25, 2018: [Order]
  • September 14, 2018: [Reply to Response]
August, 2018
  • August 09, 2018: [Certificate of Service]
  • August 07, 2018: [Response in Opposition]
July, 2018
  • July 23, 2018: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
  • July 10, 2018: [Order]
  • July 09, 2018: [Writ]
February, 2018
  • February 23, 2018: [Judgment Returned Executed]
  • February 20, 2018: [Transcript (DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS)]
December, 2017
  • December 05, 2017: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • December 05, 2017: [Modify Conditions of Release]
August, 2017
  • August 24, 2017: [Order on Petition re: Probation/Supervised Release (12B)]
July, 2017
  • July 20, 2017: [Amended Judgment]
  • July 18, 2017: [Judgment]
  • July 17, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • July 17, 2017: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • July 17, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • July 07, 2017: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • July 07, 2017: [Dismiss]
  • July 07, 2017: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • July 07, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • July 06, 2017: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • July 06, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • July 06, 2017: [Digital Audio File]
March, 2017
  • March 30, 2017: [Notice of Assignment (Probation)]
  • March 30, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
  • March 30, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • March 30, 2017: [~Util - Plea Entered]
February, 2017
  • February 17, 2017: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
November, 2016
  • November 17, 2016: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • November 10, 2016: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • November 10, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • November 10, 2016: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
  • November 10, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue]
August, 2016
  • August 22, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 08, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 08, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • August 08, 2016: [Continue]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.