U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:11-cr-00003-1
  • Case Name: USA v. McMillan
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2019
  • August 12, 2019: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • August 07, 2019: [Exhibit List]
  • August 05, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • August 05, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
July, 2019
  • July 29, 2019: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • July 11, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • July 09, 2019: [Order]
June, 2019
  • June 26, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 26, 2019: [Waiver of Preliminary Examination or Hearing]
  • June 26, 2019: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • June 26, 2019: [Order of Temporary Detention]
  • June 26, 2019: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • June 26, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
July, 2018
  • July 16, 2018: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • July 10, 2018: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • July 06, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • July 05, 2018: [Order of Temporary Detention]
  • July 03, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • July 03, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • July 03, 2018: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • July 03, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • July 03, 2018: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
June, 2018
  • June 28, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
April, 2018
  • April 09, 2018: [Order on Petition re: Probation/Supervised Release (12B)]
August, 2016
  • August 09, 2016: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody]
  • August 09, 2016: [Release from Custody]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.