U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:01-cr-00019-1
  • Case Name: USA v. King et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2020
  • August 05, 2020: [Judgment on Revocation]
July, 2020
  • July 30, 2020: [Consent By Videoconference]
  • July 30, 2020: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • July 30, 2020: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • July 17, 2020: [Order]
  • July 17, 2020: [Order of Temporary Detention]
  • July 16, 2020: [Order on Motion to Seal or Restrict Document]
  • July 16, 2020: [Seal or Restrict Document]
  • July 16, 2020: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • July 16, 2020: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
  • July 16, 2020: [Detention Hearing]
  • July 15, 2020: [Continue]
  • July 13, 2020: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • July 13, 2020: [Consent By Videoconference]
  • July 13, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • July 13, 2020: [Continue]
  • July 13, 2020: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • July 13, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 10, 2020: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 10, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
November, 2016
  • November 01, 2016: [Transfer Out/Probationer]
August, 2016
  • August 18, 2016: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • August 18, 2016: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 18, 2016: [Dismiss]
  • August 18, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 09, 2016: [Add and Terminate Judges]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.