U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cr-00035-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Gartin et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2021
  • July 14, 2021: [Remark]
  • July 08, 2021: [Remark]
  • July 08, 2021: [Transfer Out/Supervised Release]
  • July 06, 2021: [Certified Copy of USCA Judgment/Mandate]
May, 2021
  • May 03, 2021: [Appeal Remark]
April, 2021
  • April 21, 2021: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
  • April 19, 2021: [Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
March, 2021
  • March 17, 2021: [Order]
  • March 16, 2021: [Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
February, 2021
  • February 19, 2021: [USCA Case Number]
  • February 19, 2021: [Appeal Remark]
  • February 17, 2021: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • February 12, 2021: [Appoint Counsel]
  • February 12, 2021: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • February 12, 2021: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
January, 2021
  • January 13, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • January 12, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • January 12, 2021: [Order on Motion for Compassionate Release (COVID-19)]
  • January 06, 2021: [Reply to Response]
December, 2020
  • December 17, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
November, 2020
  • November 23, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • November 19, 2020: [Notice of Conventional Filing]
  • November 19, 2020: [Response in Opposition]
  • November 09, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • November 09, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • November 03, 2020: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal or Restricted]
  • November 02, 2020: [Leave to File Document Under Seal or Restricted]
October, 2020
  • October 23, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 23, 2020: [Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • October 23, 2020: [Order]
  • October 23, 2020: [Compassionate Release (COVID-19)]
December, 2019
  • December 20, 2019: [Digital Audio File]
  • December 02, 2019: [Digital Audio File]
November, 2019
  • November 27, 2019: [Judgment]
  • November 27, 2019: [Statement of Reasons]
  • November 27, 2019: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • November 27, 2019: [Trial/Hearing Exhibit]
  • November 27, 2019: [Sentencing]
September, 2019
  • September 05, 2019: [Digital Audio File]
  • September 03, 2019: [Notice of Assignment (Probation)]
  • September 03, 2019: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • September 03, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • September 03, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • September 03, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • September 03, 2019: [~Util - Plea Entered]
August, 2019
  • August 28, 2019: [Notice of Intent To Change Plea To Guilty]
  • August 20, 2019: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
  • August 20, 2019: [Sealed Document]
  • August 06, 2019: [Response to Motion]
  • August 02, 2019: [Docket Annotation]
  • August 01, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Document]
  • August 01, 2019: [In Limine]
July, 2019
  • July 02, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • July 01, 2019: [Continue]
June, 2019
  • June 28, 2019: [Notice of Intent to Use Evidence]
  • June 26, 2019: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • June 23, 2019: [Order]
  • June 21, 2019: [Trial/Hearing Exhibit]
May, 2019
  • May 24, 2019: [Notice of Calendar Setting]
  • May 21, 2019: [Psychiatric Report]
  • May 15, 2019: [Notice of Calendar Setting]
April, 2019
  • April 10, 2019: [Status Conference]
March, 2019
  • March 12, 2019: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 07, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 06, 2019: [Trial Order]
  • March 06, 2019: [Bond Hearing]
  • March 06, 2019: [Scheduling Conference]
  • March 02, 2019: [Order]
February, 2019
  • February 28, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 15, 2019: [Psychiatric Report]
August, 2018
  • August 21, 2018: [Order]
  • August 21, 2018: [Trial/Hearing Exhibit]
  • August 21, 2018: [Competency Hearing]
June, 2018
  • June 01, 2018: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
May, 2018
  • May 31, 2018: [Order on Motion for Psychiatric Exam]
  • May 31, 2018: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 25, 2018: [Remark]
  • May 24, 2018: [Order]
  • May 23, 2018: [Remark]
  • May 22, 2018: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
  • May 18, 2018: [Transcript (DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS)]
  • May 18, 2018: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • May 17, 2018: [Pretrial Conference]
  • May 17, 2018: [Motion Hearing]
  • May 17, 2018: [Order on Motion for Psychiatric Exam]
  • May 17, 2018: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 16, 2018: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • May 16, 2018: [Response]
  • May 15, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 07, 2018: [Psychiatric Exam]
  • May 07, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 02, 2018: [Notice of Calendar Setting]
March, 2018
  • March 16, 2018: [Trial Order]
  • March 16, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • March 15, 2018: [Continue]
  • March 15, 2018: [Digital Audio File]
  • March 15, 2018: [Order Regarding Discovery]
  • March 15, 2018: [Trial Order]
  • March 15, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 15, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • March 07, 2018: [Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney]
  • March 07, 2018: [Substitute Attorney]
  • March 07, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • March 07, 2018: [Remark]
  • March 07, 2018: [Notice of Hearing]
  • March 05, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • March 01, 2018: [Arrest - Other District]
  • March 01, 2018: [Rule 5 Documents Received]
January, 2018
  • January 16, 2018: [Digital Audio File]
  • January 15, 2018: [Digital Audio File]
October, 2017
  • October 18, 2017: [Remark]
  • October 18, 2017: [Judgment Returned Executed]
August, 2017
  • August 23, 2017: [Judgment]
  • August 23, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • August 22, 2017: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • August 22, 2017: [Trial/Hearing Exhibit]
  • August 22, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • August 10, 2017: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
June, 2017
  • June 20, 2017: [Digital Audio File]
May, 2017
  • May 17, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
  • May 17, 2017: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • May 02, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
  • May 02, 2017: [In Chambers Conference]
  • May 02, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
April, 2017
  • April 17, 2017: [Continue]
  • April 11, 2017: [Remark]
  • April 11, 2017: [Rule 20 - Transfer Out]
March, 2017
  • March 20, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • March 20, 2017: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • March 20, 2017: [Continue]
  • March 17, 2017: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
  • March 14, 2017: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • March 14, 2017: [Extension of Time to File Document]
  • March 03, 2017: [Notice of Hearing]
January, 2017
  • January 12, 2017: [Continue]
  • January 11, 2017: [Order]
November, 2016
  • November 03, 2016: [Continue]
  • November 01, 2016: [Continue]
  • November 01, 2016: [Order]
September, 2016
  • September 12, 2016: [Docket Annotation]
  • September 09, 2016: [Trial Order]
  • September 09, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • September 09, 2016: [Continue]
  • September 08, 2016: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • September 02, 2016: [Digital Audio File]
August, 2016
  • August 30, 2016: [Notice of Assignment (Probation)]
  • August 30, 2016: [Order Regarding Discovery]
  • August 30, 2016: [Trial Order]
  • August 30, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • August 30, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • August 30, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • August 30, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • August 29, 2016: [Arrest - Other District]
  • August 29, 2016: [Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received]
  • August 25, 2016: [Notice of Hearing]
  • August 22, 2016: [Digital Audio File]
  • August 17, 2016: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • August 17, 2016: [Restricted Document]
  • August 17, 2016: [Bond]
  • August 17, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
  • August 15, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 09, 2016: [Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney]
  • August 09, 2016: [Substitute Attorney]
  • August 09, 2016: [Order of Temporary Detention]
  • August 09, 2016: [Order Regarding Discovery]
  • August 09, 2016: [Trial Order]
  • August 09, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • August 09, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • August 09, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • August 09, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • August 09, 2016: [Notice of Assignment (Probation)]
  • August 09, 2016: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • August 09, 2016: [Unseal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.