U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:16-cr-00041-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Martin et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 21, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Appeal Remark]
  • March 18, 2025: [Supplemental Record Sent USCA]
  • March 13, 2025: [Transcript - Appeal]
February, 2025
  • February 07, 2025: [USCA Order]
December, 2024
  • December 12, 2024: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
January, 2023
  • January 17, 2023: [Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
December, 2022
  • December 20, 2022: [Letter]
  • December 07, 2022: [USCA Case Number]
  • December 02, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
November, 2022
  • November 28, 2022: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
August, 2021
  • August 26, 2021: [Order on Motion to Vacate (2255)]
  • August 26, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw Document]
  • August 24, 2021: [Withdraw Document]
July, 2021
  • July 08, 2021: [Order]
  • July 07, 2021: [Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
May, 2021
  • May 28, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • May 19, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • May 17, 2021: [Telephone Conference]
  • May 17, 2021: [Order on Motion for Compassionate Release (COVID-19)]
  • May 14, 2021: [Reply to Response]
April, 2021
  • April 26, 2021: [Letter]
  • April 08, 2021: [Order]
  • April 06, 2021: [Order]
  • April 05, 2021: [Order on Motion to Vacate (2255)]
  • April 05, 2021: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
March, 2021
  • March 26, 2021: [Restricted Document]
  • March 23, 2021: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal or Restricted]
  • March 18, 2021: [Leave to File Document Under Seal or Restricted]
  • March 18, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • March 17, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • March 15, 2021: [Order]
  • March 08, 2021: [Order]
  • March 08, 2021: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • March 08, 2021: [Compassionate Release (COVID-19)]
September, 2020
  • September 02, 2020: [Response to Motion]
  • September 01, 2020: [Docket Annotation]
  • September 01, 2020: [Response to Motion]
August, 2020
  • August 26, 2020: [Transcript (DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS)]
  • August 21, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • August 13, 2020: [Letter]
March, 2020
  • March 24, 2020: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
December, 2019
  • December 17, 2019: [Change of Address]
  • December 16, 2019: [Appoint Counsel]
May, 2019
  • May 20, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
March, 2019
  • March 25, 2019: [Vacate (2255) * FILE CONVENTIONALLY *]
November, 2018
  • November 07, 2018: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
September, 2018
  • September 05, 2018: [Motion Hearing]
June, 2018
  • June 25, 2018: [Order on Motion to Vacate (2255)]
  • June 25, 2018: [Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
April, 2018
  • April 09, 2018: [Response in Opposition]
March, 2018
  • March 07, 2018: [Docket Annotation]
  • March 06, 2018: [Response to Motion]
January, 2018
  • January 03, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
December, 2017
  • December 20, 2017: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • December 18, 2017: [Letter]
November, 2017
  • November 17, 2017: [Order]
September, 2017
  • September 25, 2017: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • September 25, 2017: [Vacate (2255) * FILE CONVENTIONALLY *]
February, 2017
  • February 03, 2017: [Letter]
January, 2017
  • January 03, 2017: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property]
December, 2016
  • December 30, 2016: [Forfeiture of Property]
October, 2016
  • October 07, 2016: [Amended Judgment]
  • October 04, 2016: [Digital Audio File]
September, 2016
  • September 30, 2016: [Judgment]
  • September 30, 2016: [Statement of Reasons]
  • September 22, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • September 22, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • September 16, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
August, 2016
  • August 22, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 09, 2016: [Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.