U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:08-cr-00134-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Scott
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
February, 2021
  • February 16, 2021: [Order on Motion for Compassionate Release (COVID-19)]
  • February 16, 2021: [Order on Motion to Clarify]
  • February 10, 2021: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
November, 2020
  • November 24, 2020: [Letter]
October, 2020
  • October 02, 2020: [Affidavit]
June, 2020
  • June 22, 2020: [Response in Support]
  • June 19, 2020: [Clarify]
  • June 11, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 01, 2020: [Response]
May, 2020
  • May 27, 2020: [Order]
  • May 27, 2020: [Compassionate Release (COVID-19)]
  • May 27, 2020: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • May 27, 2020: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • May 18, 2020: [Order on Motion to Reduce Sentence - First Step Act]
April, 2020
  • April 08, 2020: [Order]
March, 2020
  • March 19, 2020: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • March 19, 2020: [Reduce Sentence - First Step Act]
February, 2020
  • February 05, 2020: [Certified Copy of USCA Judgment/Mandate]
January, 2020
  • January 10, 2020: [USCA Case Number]
  • January 09, 2020: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
December, 2019
  • December 10, 2019: [Order on Motion to Reduce Sentence - First Step Act]
  • December 06, 2019: [Letter]
September, 2019
  • September 16, 2019: [Reduce Sentence - First Step Act]
July, 2019
  • July 15, 2019: [Restricted Document]
  • July 15, 2019: [Order to Reduce Sentence - First Step Act]
June, 2019
  • June 03, 2019: [Response]
  • June 03, 2019: [Letter]
May, 2019
  • May 20, 2019: [Appoint Counsel]
March, 2019
  • March 20, 2019: [Certified Copy of USCA Judgment/Mandate]
July, 2018
  • July 10, 2018: [Appeal Remark]
June, 2018
  • June 20, 2018: [Appeal Remark]
May, 2018
  • May 29, 2018: [Certified Copy of USCA Judgment/Mandate]
  • May 16, 2018: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
  • May 14, 2018: [Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
  • May 03, 2018: [Appeal Remark]
  • May 03, 2018: [USCA Case Number]
April, 2018
  • April 20, 2018: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • April 06, 2018: [Order on Motion to Set Aside Judgment]
March, 2018
  • March 23, 2018: [Set Aside Judgment]
September, 2017
  • September 12, 2017: [Certified Copy of USCA Judgment/Mandate]
June, 2017
  • June 05, 2017: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • June 01, 2017: [Change of Address]
January, 2017
  • January 23, 2017: [Compel]
  • January 19, 2017: [Electronic Record on Appeal Accepted]
November, 2016
  • November 18, 2016: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
October, 2016
  • October 28, 2016: [Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
  • October 28, 2016: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
September, 2016
  • September 22, 2016: [Certificate of Appealability Denied]
  • September 21, 2016: [Order on Motion to Vacate (2255)]
  • September 15, 2016: [Response in Opposition]
August, 2016
  • August 31, 2016: [Response in Opposition]
  • August 17, 2016: [Change of Address]
  • August 17, 2016: [Letter]
  • August 10, 2016: [Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.