U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:14-cr-00130-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Whitfield
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2021
  • August 02, 2021: [Transcript (DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS)]
July, 2021
  • July 02, 2021: [Order]
  • July 01, 2021: [Letter]
June, 2021
  • June 30, 2021: [Order on Motion to Produce]
  • June 30, 2021: [Order on Motion to Expedite]
March, 2021
  • March 29, 2021: [Expedite]
  • March 29, 2021: [Produce]
October, 2019
  • October 16, 2019: [Mail Returned]
September, 2019
  • September 12, 2019: [Judgment - 2255]
  • September 12, 2019: [Order on Motion to Vacate (2255)]
  • September 12, 2019: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
May, 2019
  • May 31, 2019: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 15, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 10, 2019: [Docket Annotation]
  • May 10, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • May 10, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
September, 2017
  • September 07, 2017: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
August, 2017
  • August 25, 2017: [Response in Opposition]
July, 2017
  • July 31, 2017: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
June, 2017
  • June 01, 2017: [Response in Opposition]
May, 2017
  • May 05, 2017: [Affidavit]
April, 2017
  • April 06, 2017: [Order]
  • April 05, 2017: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 05, 2017: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • April 04, 2017: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • April 04, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
March, 2017
  • March 06, 2017: [Order]
  • March 02, 2017: [Response to Order]
  • March 02, 2017: [Order]
August, 2016
  • August 10, 2016: [Vacate (2255) * FILE CONVENTIONALLY *]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.