U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:16-cr-00031-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Carney
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2016
  • October 12, 2016: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • October 12, 2016: [Statement of Reasons]
  • October 06, 2016: [Exhibit (Document)]
  • October 06, 2016: [Exhibit List]
  • October 06, 2016: [Sealed Document]
  • October 06, 2016: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • October 05, 2016: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • October 03, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
September, 2016
  • September 29, 2016: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • September 29, 2016: [Bond]
  • September 29, 2016: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • September 29, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • September 29, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • September 29, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
August, 2016
  • August 10, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.