U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:06-cr-00021-2
  • Case Name: USA v. Kindred et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2017
  • August 21, 2017: [Order]
October, 2016
  • October 19, 2016: [Discovery Hearing]
September, 2016
  • September 27, 2016: [U.S. Marshal's Return]
August, 2016
  • August 15, 2016: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 11, 2016: [Docket Annotation]
  • August 11, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.