U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:12-cr-00078-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Brandon
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 19, 2022: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • September 09, 2022: [Exhibit List]
July, 2022
  • July 28, 2022: [Order of Temporary Detention]
  • July 28, 2022: [Waiver of Preliminary Examination or Hearing]
  • July 28, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • July 28, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • July 28, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • July 28, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 27, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
April, 2022
  • April 04, 2022: [Judgment on Revocation]
January, 2022
  • January 06, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
June, 2021
  • June 17, 2021: [Exhibit List]
  • June 14, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
May, 2021
  • May 14, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 14, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • May 14, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • May 13, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • May 13, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
January, 2021
  • January 12, 2021: [Add and Terminate Judges]
November, 2020
  • November 06, 2020: [Order on Petition re: Probation/Supervised Release (12B)]
March, 2020
  • March 26, 2020: [Digital Audio File]
October, 2019
  • October 09, 2019: [Judgment on Revocation]
September, 2019
  • September 18, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • September 11, 2019: [Order of Temporary Detention]
  • September 11, 2019: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • September 11, 2019: [Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney]
  • September 11, 2019: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • September 11, 2019: [Substitute Attorney]
  • September 11, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • September 11, 2019: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • September 11, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
June, 2018
  • June 19, 2018: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • June 19, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • June 05, 2018: [Sealed Document]
  • June 05, 2018: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
May, 2018
  • May 14, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 11, 2018: [Order of Temporary Detention]
  • May 11, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • May 11, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • May 11, 2018: [Exhibit List]
  • May 11, 2018: [Docket Annotation]
  • May 11, 2018: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • May 11, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • May 10, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • May 09, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
August, 2016
  • August 12, 2016: [Notice of Assignment (Probation)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.