U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:06-cr-00001-7
  • Case Name: USA v. Lucas et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2021
  • August 26, 2021: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • August 25, 2021: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • August 11, 2021: [Trial/Hearing Exhibit]
  • August 10, 2021: [Modify Conditions of Release]
May, 2021
  • May 11, 2021: [Trial/Hearing Exhibit]
March, 2021
  • March 05, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • March 05, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • March 05, 2021: [Order to Unseal Document]
  • March 03, 2021: [Summons Returned Executed]
December, 2020
  • December 28, 2020: [Copy of Opinion - USCA]
  • December 28, 2020: [Certified Copy of USCA Judgment/Mandate]
June, 2020
  • June 08, 2020: [Digital Audio File]
May, 2020
  • May 05, 2020: [Electronic Record on Appeal Accepted]
  • May 04, 2020: [Appeal Record Sent to USCA]
March, 2020
  • March 23, 2020: [Transcript - Appeal]
  • March 04, 2020: [USCA Case Number]
  • March 03, 2020: [Transcript Request - Appeal]
February, 2020
  • February 27, 2020: [Appeal Remark]
  • February 26, 2020: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • February 13, 2020: [Judgment on Revocation]
November, 2019
  • November 14, 2019: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • November 13, 2019: [Order]
  • November 13, 2019: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • November 13, 2019: [Waiver of Preliminary Examination or Hearing]
  • November 13, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • November 13, 2019: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • November 13, 2019: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • November 13, 2019: [Order to Unseal Document]
  • November 07, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
April, 2017
  • April 24, 2017: [Letter]
  • April 21, 2017: [Change of Address]
October, 2016
  • October 19, 2016: [Discovery Hearing]
  • October 11, 2016: [U.S. Marshal's Return]
  • October 03, 2016: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
September, 2016
  • September 30, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 27, 2016: [U.S. Marshal's Return]
August, 2016
  • August 24, 2016: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 23, 2016: [Order on Motion to Withdraw Document]
  • August 23, 2016: [Withdraw Document]
  • August 23, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 16, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 16, 2016: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 16, 2016: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • August 15, 2016: [Docket Annotation]
  • August 15, 2016: [Amend/Correct]
  • August 15, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.