U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:12-cr-00105-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Terrazas
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2021
  • May 04, 2021: [Certified Copy of USCA Judgment/Mandate]
March, 2021
  • March 04, 2021: [Electronic Record on Appeal Accepted]
  • March 04, 2021: [Appeal Record Sent to USCA]
  • March 04, 2021: [USCA Case Number]
  • March 04, 2021: [Appeal Remark]
  • March 02, 2021: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
  • March 01, 2021: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • March 01, 2021: [Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
November, 2020
  • November 30, 2020: [Mail Returned]
  • November 09, 2020: [Order on Motion for Compassionate Release (COVID-19)]
  • November 06, 2020: [Notice of Conventional Filing]
October, 2020
  • October 26, 2020: [Seal or Restrict]
  • October 26, 2020: [Reply to Response]
  • October 16, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
September, 2020
  • September 16, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • September 16, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • September 11, 2020: [Docket Annotation]
  • September 11, 2020: [Notice of Conventional Filing]
  • September 11, 2020: [Response in Opposition]
  • September 11, 2020: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal or Restricted]
  • September 10, 2020: [Leave to File Document Under Seal or Restricted]
  • September 01, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 01, 2020: [Order]
August, 2020
  • August 31, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • August 31, 2020: [Order]
  • August 31, 2020: [Compassionate Release (COVID-19)]
October, 2018
  • October 31, 2018: [Change of Address]
August, 2016
  • August 15, 2016: [Restricted Document]
  • August 15, 2016: [Order Reducing Sentence - USSC Amendment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.