U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:09-cr-00023-2
  • Case Name: USA v. Miller et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2021
  • January 11, 2021: [Order on Restricted Motion]
  • January 04, 2021: [Mail Returned]
December, 2020
  • December 23, 2020: [Reply to Response]
  • December 14, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • December 07, 2020: [Restricted Document]
November, 2020
  • November 30, 2020: [Response in Opposition]
  • November 24, 2020: [Leave to File Document Under Seal or Restricted]
  • November 24, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • November 18, 2020: [Restricted Motion]
September, 2020
  • September 28, 2020: [Order on Motion for Compassionate Release (COVID-19)]
August, 2020
  • August 13, 2020: [Reply to Response]
July, 2020
  • July 29, 2020: [Docket Annotation]
  • July 29, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • July 09, 2020: [Notice of Conventional Filing]
  • July 09, 2020: [Response in Opposition]
June, 2020
  • June 25, 2020: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal or Restricted]
  • June 25, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • June 25, 2020: [Order]
  • June 25, 2020: [Leave to File Document Under Seal or Restricted]
  • June 25, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • June 24, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • June 17, 2020: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • June 16, 2020: [Order]
  • June 16, 2020: [Compassionate Release (COVID-19)]
August, 2016
  • August 15, 2016: [Restricted Document]
  • August 15, 2016: [Order Reducing Sentence - USSC Amendment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.