U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:07-cr-00003-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Irby
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2021
  • April 21, 2021: [Unclaimed Exhibits Destroyed]
February, 2021
  • February 26, 2021: [Notice of Disposal of Trial Exhibits]
November, 2017
  • November 22, 2017: [Order]
  • November 22, 2017: [Order on Motion to Vacate (2255)]
  • November 20, 2017: [Change of Address]
  • November 20, 2017: [Vacate (2255) * FILE CONVENTIONALLY *]
October, 2016
  • October 19, 2016: [Discovery Hearing]
  • October 11, 2016: [U.S. Marshal's Return]
August, 2016
  • August 15, 2016: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 15, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.