U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:14-cr-00005-2
  • Case Name: USA v. Edwards et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
February, 2022
  • February 15, 2022: [Order]
October, 2021
  • October 12, 2021: [Letter]
July, 2021
  • July 15, 2021: [Letter]
April, 2021
  • April 14, 2021: [Order on Motion for Compassionate Release (COVID-19)]
March, 2021
  • March 22, 2021: [Restricted Document]
  • March 22, 2021: [Notice of Conventional Filing]
  • March 12, 2021: [Reply to Response]
  • March 08, 2021: [Restricted Document]
  • March 08, 2021: [Notice of Conventional Filing]
  • March 08, 2021: [Response in Opposition]
February, 2021
  • February 25, 2021: [Leave to File Document Under Seal or Restricted]
  • February 25, 2021: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal or Restricted]
  • February 24, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • February 24, 2021: [Leave to File Document Under Seal or Restricted]
  • February 24, 2021: [Compassionate Release (COVID-19)]
  • February 09, 2021: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • February 09, 2021: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • February 09, 2021: [Docket Annotation]
  • February 08, 2021: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • February 08, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
January, 2021
  • January 29, 2021: [Order]
  • January 28, 2021: [Digital Audio File]
December, 2020
  • December 03, 2020: [Judgment]
  • December 03, 2020: [Order]
  • December 03, 2020: [Statement of Reasons]
November, 2020
  • November 24, 2020: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • November 24, 2020: [Sentencing]
August, 2020
  • August 05, 2020: [Digital Audio File]
July, 2020
  • July 29, 2020: [Notice of Assignment (Probation)]
  • July 29, 2020: [Plea Agreement]
  • July 28, 2020: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • July 28, 2020: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • July 21, 2020: [Notice of Intent To Change Plea To Guilty]
  • July 14, 2020: [Trial Order]
  • July 14, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • July 13, 2020: [Continue]
June, 2020
  • June 17, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 09, 2020: [Telephone Conference]
  • June 09, 2020: [Set/Reset Hearings]
March, 2020
  • March 31, 2020: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • March 31, 2020: [Order]
  • March 31, 2020: [Continue]
February, 2020
  • February 05, 2020: [Trial/Hearing Exhibit (Sealed)]
  • February 05, 2020: [Order of Detention]
  • February 05, 2020: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • February 05, 2020: [Detention Hearing]
  • February 04, 2020: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • February 04, 2020: [Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney]
  • February 04, 2020: [Substitute Attorney]
  • February 04, 2020: [Order]
  • February 04, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 04, 2020: [Trial Order]
  • February 04, 2020: [Order Regarding Discovery]
  • February 04, 2020: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • February 04, 2020: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • February 04, 2020: [Docket Annotation]
  • February 04, 2020: [Initial Appearance]
  • February 04, 2020: [Arraignment]
  • February 04, 2020: [Order to Unseal Case]
April, 2019
  • April 15, 2019: [Order on Report re: Probation/Supervised Release (35)]
January, 2019
  • January 31, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
February, 2018
  • February 06, 2018: [Letter]
  • February 02, 2018: [Letter]
February, 2017
  • February 06, 2017: [Letter]
  • February 03, 2017: [Letter]
January, 2017
  • January 27, 2017: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 26, 2017: [Transfer Out/Supervised Release]
  • January 12, 2017: [Letter]
December, 2016
  • December 23, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 23, 2016: [Letter]
November, 2016
  • November 22, 2016: [Letter]
October, 2016
  • October 21, 2016: [Letter]
  • October 20, 2016: [Letter]
August, 2016
  • August 16, 2016: [Letter]
  • August 15, 2016: [Letter]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.