U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:06-cr-00005-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Mosley
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2017
  • June 29, 2017: [Order on Motion to Quash]
  • June 28, 2017: [Quash]
  • June 12, 2017: [Answer to Writ of Garnishment]
May, 2017
  • May 22, 2017: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
  • May 22, 2017: [Writ Issued]
  • May 17, 2017: [Application for Writ]
October, 2016
  • October 03, 2016: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
September, 2016
  • September 30, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 27, 2016: [U.S. Marshal's Return]
August, 2016
  • August 17, 2016: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 16, 2016: [Order Reassigning Case]
  • August 16, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.