U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:12-cr-00059-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Cameron et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2021
  • December 20, 2021: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • December 15, 2021: [Trial/Hearing Exhibit]
  • December 15, 2021: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
November, 2021
  • November 24, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • November 24, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 23, 2021: [Order on Motion for Bond]
  • November 23, 2021: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
  • November 23, 2021: [Motion Hearing]
  • November 23, 2021: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • November 23, 2021: [Docket Annotation]
  • November 22, 2021: [Order on Motion to Unseal Document]
  • November 22, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • November 22, 2021: [Unseal Document]
  • November 22, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • November 22, 2021: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • November 22, 2021: [Bond]
  • November 22, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
June, 2019
  • June 28, 2019: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • June 27, 2019: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • June 19, 2019: [Order on Motion to Unseal Document]
  • June 19, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • June 19, 2019: [Waiver of Preliminary Examination or Hearing]
  • June 19, 2019: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • June 19, 2019: [Unseal Document]
  • June 19, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • June 19, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 19, 2019: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • June 18, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • June 17, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
January, 2019
  • January 28, 2019: [Letter]
June, 2017
  • June 05, 2017: [Letter]
March, 2017
  • March 09, 2017: [Certified Copy of USCA Judgment/Mandate]
February, 2017
  • February 07, 2017: [Order on Motion to Reduce Sentence - USSC Amendment]
  • February 06, 2017: [Change of Address]
  • February 06, 2017: [Reduce Sentence - USSC Amendment]
January, 2017
  • January 20, 2017: [Electronic Record on Appeal Accepted]
  • January 18, 2017: [Appeal Remark]
  • January 13, 2017: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
  • January 11, 2017: [Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
December, 2016
  • December 21, 2016: [USCA Case Number]
  • December 21, 2016: [Appeal Remark]
  • December 19, 2016: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody]
  • December 16, 2016: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • December 07, 2016: [Change of Address]
  • December 07, 2016: [Release from Custody]
November, 2016
  • November 30, 2016: [Certificate of Appealability]
  • November 30, 2016: [Order on Motion to Vacate (2255)]
  • November 23, 2016: [Reply to Response]
  • November 09, 2016: [Response in Opposition]
October, 2016
  • October 31, 2016: [Order]
  • October 24, 2016: [Vacate (2255) * FILE CONVENTIONALLY *]
August, 2016
  • August 16, 2016: [Restricted Document]
  • August 16, 2016: [Order Reducing Sentence - USSC Amendment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.