U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:16-cr-00033-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Terwilliger
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2019
  • September 23, 2019: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • September 17, 2019: [Withdraw as Attorney]
June, 2017
  • June 01, 2017: [Transfer Out/Probationer]
August, 2016
  • August 26, 2016: [Digital Audio File]
  • August 26, 2016: [Judgment]
  • August 25, 2016: [Statement of Reasons]
  • August 24, 2016: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • August 24, 2016: [Consent to Proceed Before US Magistrate Judge]
  • August 23, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • August 23, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
  • August 22, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • August 22, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • August 22, 2016: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • August 18, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.