U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:14-cr-00036-2
  • Case Name: USA v. Chapman et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • March 19, 2025: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • March 19, 2025: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 18, 2025: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 13, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • March 12, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 12, 2025: [Response]
  • March 12, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • March 12, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
January, 2023
  • January 25, 2023: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • January 25, 2023: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 24, 2023: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • January 20, 2023: [Order]
  • January 19, 2023: [Compassionate Release (COVID-19)]
May, 2022
  • May 23, 2022: [Unclaimed Exhibits Destroyed]
  • May 23, 2022: [Receipt - Release of Exhibits]
  • May 11, 2022: [Notice of Disposal of Trial Exhibits]
April, 2022
  • April 04, 2022: [Writ of Certiorari Denied - Supreme Court]
December, 2021
  • December 28, 2021: [USCA Order]
October, 2021
  • October 21, 2021: [Certified Copy of USCA Judgment/Mandate]
  • October 21, 2021: [Copy of Opinion - USCA]
August, 2021
  • August 04, 2021: [Certified Copy of USCA Judgment/Mandate]
June, 2021
  • June 23, 2021: [Appeal Remark]
  • June 16, 2021: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
April, 2021
  • April 29, 2021: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • April 29, 2021: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • April 21, 2021: [Reconsideration]
  • April 21, 2021: [Appoint Counsel]
March, 2021
  • March 30, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 29, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 09, 2021: [Letter]
November, 2020
  • November 18, 2020: [USCA Order]
July, 2020
  • July 31, 2020: [USCA Order]
May, 2020
  • May 11, 2020: [USCA Order]
February, 2020
  • February 28, 2020: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • February 12, 2020: [Remark]
  • February 10, 2020: [Change of Address]
January, 2020
  • January 10, 2020: [Appeal Remark]
  • January 08, 2020: [USCA Order]
December, 2019
  • December 31, 2019: [Appeal Remark]
  • December 27, 2019: [Appeal Remark]
  • December 13, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 13, 2019: [Response to Motion]
  • December 09, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
November, 2019
  • November 27, 2019: [USCA Order]
  • November 04, 2019: [USCA Order]
October, 2019
  • October 16, 2019: [Order on Motion for Bond]
  • October 16, 2019: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • October 11, 2019: [Bond]
  • October 11, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 11, 2019: [Appoint Counsel]
September, 2019
  • September 27, 2019: [USCA Order]
  • September 12, 2019: [Trial/Hearing Exhibit (Sealed)]
  • September 12, 2019: [Trial/Hearing Exhibit]
  • September 11, 2019: [Order on Motion to Seal or Restrict]
  • September 11, 2019: [Seal or Restrict]
August, 2019
  • August 21, 2019: [USCA Order]
  • August 09, 2019: [USCA Order]
  • August 05, 2019: [Transcript - Appeal]
July, 2019
  • July 17, 2019: [Transcript - Appeal]
  • July 05, 2019: [Appeal Remark]
June, 2019
  • June 26, 2019: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 18, 2019: [Transcript Request - Appeal]
  • June 17, 2019: [Transcript Request - Appeal]
  • June 15, 2019: [Transcript Request - Appeal]
  • June 15, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 10, 2019: [Appeal Remark]
  • June 10, 2019: [Remark]
January, 2019
  • January 30, 2019: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • January 29, 2019: [Reconsideration]
  • January 02, 2019: [Certified Copy of USCA Judgment/Mandate]
September, 2018
  • September 10, 2018: [Change of Address]
July, 2018
  • July 24, 2018: [USCA Order]
May, 2018
  • May 30, 2018: [USCA Order]
April, 2018
  • April 16, 2018: [Electronic Record on Appeal Accepted]
  • April 09, 2018: [Appeal Record Sent to USCA]
  • April 09, 2018: [Appeal Remark]
March, 2018
  • March 16, 2018: [USCA Case Number]
  • March 16, 2018: [Appeal Remark]
  • March 07, 2018: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
January, 2018
  • January 16, 2018: [Certificate of Appealability]
  • January 16, 2018: [Order on Motion to Vacate (2255)]
June, 2017
  • June 06, 2017: [Letter]
April, 2017
  • April 03, 2017: [Reply to Response]
March, 2017
  • March 09, 2017: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • March 07, 2017: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
  • March 07, 2017: [Docket Annotation]
  • March 02, 2017: [Response in Opposition]
February, 2017
  • February 24, 2017: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • February 14, 2017: [Mail Returned]
  • February 10, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • February 09, 2017: [Mail Returned]
  • February 01, 2017: [Order]
January, 2017
  • January 30, 2017: [Vacate (2255) * FILE CONVENTIONALLY *]
  • January 03, 2017: [Electronic Record on Appeal Accepted]
December, 2016
  • December 28, 2016: [Appeal Remark]
  • December 15, 2016: [Appeal Remark]
  • December 13, 2016: [USCA Appeal Fees]
  • December 02, 2016: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 02, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 01, 2016: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
November, 2016
  • November 29, 2016: [USCA Case Number]
  • November 29, 2016: [Appeal Remark]
  • November 29, 2016: [Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
  • November 21, 2016: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • November 20, 2016: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • November 17, 2016: [Reconsideration]
  • November 07, 2016: [Certificate of Appealability]
  • November 07, 2016: [Order on Motion to Vacate (2255)]
  • November 07, 2016: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
October, 2016
  • October 26, 2016: [Transcript (DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS)]
  • October 26, 2016: [Sealed Transcript]
September, 2016
  • September 06, 2016: [Mail Returned]
  • September 06, 2016: [Transcript - Appeal]
  • September 01, 2016: [Mail Returned]
August, 2016
  • August 29, 2016: [Mail Returned]
  • August 26, 2016: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appeal]
  • August 26, 2016: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • August 26, 2016: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document]
  • August 26, 2016: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
  • August 24, 2016: [Transcript - Appeal]
  • August 22, 2016: [Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
  • August 22, 2016: [Appoint Counsel]
  • August 22, 2016: [Leave to Appeal]
  • August 22, 2016: [Leave to File Document]
  • August 18, 2016: [Transcript Request]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.