U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:14-cr-00009-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Sinha et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2020
  • April 01, 2020: [Certificate of Appealability]
  • April 01, 2020: [Judgment - 2255]
  • April 01, 2020: [Order on Motion to Vacate (2255)]
January, 2020
  • January 30, 2020: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • January 30, 2020: [Trial/Hearing Exhibit]
  • January 28, 2020: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • January 24, 2020: [Order on Motion to Unseal Document]
  • January 24, 2020: [Order of Detention]
  • January 24, 2020: [Waiver of Preliminary Examination or Hearing]
  • January 24, 2020: [Waiver]
  • January 24, 2020: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • January 23, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
February, 2019
  • February 11, 2019: [Certified Copy of USCA Judgment/Mandate]
  • February 11, 2019: [Copy of Opinion - USCA]
November, 2018
  • November 01, 2018: [Change of Address]
September, 2018
  • September 28, 2018: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • September 25, 2018: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • September 25, 2018: [Trial/Hearing Exhibit]
  • September 10, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
August, 2018
  • August 27, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • August 27, 2018: [Continue]
  • August 27, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 24, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • August 24, 2018: [Waiver of Preliminary Examination or Hearing]
  • August 24, 2018: [Waiver]
  • August 24, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • August 24, 2018: [Order on Motion to Unseal Document]
June, 2018
  • June 22, 2018: [Electronic Record on Appeal Accepted]
  • June 20, 2018: [Appeal Remark]
  • June 18, 2018: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
  • June 15, 2018: [Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
May, 2018
  • May 25, 2018: [Appeal Remark]
  • May 25, 2018: [USCA Case Number]
  • May 18, 2018: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
April, 2018
  • April 17, 2018: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 17, 2018: [Order on Motion to Clarify]
  • April 17, 2018: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
March, 2018
  • March 30, 2018: [Affidavit]
  • March 30, 2018: [Rebuttal]
  • March 19, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 19, 2018: [Amend/Correct]
  • March 19, 2018: [Clarify]
February, 2018
  • February 21, 2018: [Order on Motion to Clarify]
  • February 21, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • February 15, 2018: [Remark]
  • February 15, 2018: [Clarify]
  • February 15, 2018: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
January, 2018
  • January 12, 2018: [Response in Opposition]
  • January 05, 2018: [Affidavit]
  • January 04, 2018: [Affidavit]
December, 2017
  • December 08, 2017: [Order]
  • December 04, 2017: [Vacate (2255) * FILE CONVENTIONALLY *]
November, 2017
  • November 15, 2017: [Judgment Returned Executed]
August, 2017
  • August 30, 2017: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • August 30, 2017: [Digital Audio File]
  • August 30, 2017: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • August 03, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • August 03, 2017: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
July, 2017
  • July 31, 2017: [Order on Motion to Unseal Document]
  • July 28, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • July 27, 2017: [Continue]
  • July 18, 2017: [Order on Motion to Unseal Document]
  • July 18, 2017: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • July 18, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • July 18, 2017: [Waiver of Preliminary Examination or Hearing]
  • July 18, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • July 18, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • July 18, 2017: [Unseal Document]
  • July 18, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 18, 2017: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • July 18, 2017: [Order on Petition for Warrant/Summons (12C)]
  • July 17, 2017: [Notice of Hearing]
  • July 10, 2017: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • July 07, 2017: [Trial/Hearing Exhibit - Government]
  • July 07, 2017: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
June, 2017
  • June 26, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • June 26, 2017: [Waiver of Preliminary Examination or Hearing]
  • June 26, 2017: [Waiver]
  • June 26, 2017: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • June 26, 2017: [Order on Motion to Unseal Document]
  • June 26, 2017: [Unseal Document]
  • June 26, 2017: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • June 26, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 23, 2017: [Notice of Hearing]
November, 2016
  • November 29, 2016: [Appeal Remark]
August, 2016
  • August 19, 2016: [Certified Copy of USCA Judgment/Mandate]
  • August 19, 2016: [Copy of Opinion - USCA]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.