U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:09-cr-00098-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Haley
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2016
  • November 29, 2016: [Restricted Document]
  • November 29, 2016: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • November 09, 2016: [Statement of Reasons]
  • November 04, 2016: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • November 03, 2016: [Order of Temporary Detention]
  • November 03, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • November 02, 2016: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • November 02, 2016: [Waiver of Preliminary Examination or Hearing]
  • November 02, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 02, 2016: [Waiver]
  • November 02, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • November 02, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • November 02, 2016: [Warrant Returned Executed]
October, 2016
  • October 27, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 11, 2016: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • October 11, 2016: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • October 07, 2016: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
August, 2016
  • August 31, 2016: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 19, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.