U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:16-cr-00049-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Evans
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2020
  • November 23, 2020: [Dismissal of Counts on Government Motion]
  • November 23, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Parties]
  • November 23, 2020: [Order]
  • November 18, 2020: [Status Report]
June, 2018
  • June 21, 2018: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 21, 2018: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • June 21, 2018: [Order on Motion in Limine]
March, 2018
  • March 20, 2018: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • March 16, 2018: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
  • March 13, 2018: [In Limine]
  • March 13, 2018: [Compel]
  • March 13, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 12, 2018: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • March 12, 2018: [In Limine]
  • March 09, 2018: [Subpoena Returned]
January, 2018
  • January 18, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 08, 2018: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • January 08, 2018: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • January 05, 2018: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
December, 2017
  • December 22, 2017: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • December 13, 2017: [Docket Call]
October, 2017
  • October 23, 2017: [Order]
May, 2017
  • May 18, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • May 17, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
April, 2017
  • April 18, 2017: [Subpoena Returned]
  • April 14, 2017: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 14, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • April 11, 2017: [Response]
March, 2017
  • March 31, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 21, 2017: [Status Conference]
  • March 08, 2017: [Continue]
  • March 06, 2017: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 02, 2017: [Order]
August, 2016
  • August 31, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 31, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • August 30, 2016: [Continue]
  • August 24, 2016: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • August 24, 2016: [Order Regarding Discovery]
  • August 24, 2016: [Bond]
  • August 24, 2016: [Trial Order]
  • August 24, 2016: [Digital Audio File]
  • August 24, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • August 24, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • August 22, 2016: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • August 22, 2016: [Unseal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.