U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:13-cr-00092-2
  • Case Name: USA v. Lamas et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
February, 2022
  • February 14, 2022: [Remark]
January, 2022
  • January 31, 2022: [Remark]
  • January 31, 2022: [Transfer Out/Supervised Release]
August, 2017
  • August 10, 2017: [Certificate of Appealability]
  • August 10, 2017: [Order on Motion to Vacate (2255)]
September, 2016
  • September 30, 2016: [Response in Opposition]
August, 2016
  • August 24, 2016: [Order]
  • August 23, 2016: [Vacate (2255) * FILE CONVENTIONALLY *]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.