U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cr-00052-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Pittman
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2021
  • August 19, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • August 17, 2021: [Order on Motion for Compassionate Release (COVID-19)]
  • August 13, 2021: [Reply to Response]
July, 2021
  • July 19, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • July 15, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • July 08, 2021: [Notice of Conventional Filing]
  • July 08, 2021: [Response in Opposition]
  • July 06, 2021: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal or Restricted]
  • July 02, 2021: [Leave to File Document Under Seal or Restricted]
  • July 02, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 01, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • July 01, 2021: [Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • July 01, 2021: [Order]
  • July 01, 2021: [Compassionate Release (COVID-19)]
March, 2018
  • March 28, 2018: [Certified Copy of USCA Judgment/Mandate]
  • March 28, 2018: [Copy of Opinion - USCA]
August, 2017
  • August 17, 2017: [Appeal Remark]
  • August 16, 2017: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • August 16, 2017: [Order]
  • August 16, 2017: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • August 15, 2017: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • August 14, 2017: [Withdraw as Attorney]
July, 2017
  • July 13, 2017: [USCA Order]
  • July 12, 2017: [Electronic Record on Appeal Accepted]
  • July 06, 2017: [Transcript - Appeal]
June, 2017
  • June 20, 2017: [Digital Audio File]
  • June 07, 2017: [Appeal Remark]
  • June 06, 2017: [Appeal Remark]
  • June 06, 2017: [USCA Case Number]
  • June 05, 2017: [Transcript Request - Appeal]
May, 2017
  • May 30, 2017: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • May 17, 2017: [Judgment]
  • May 17, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • May 16, 2017: [Trial/Hearing Exhibit - Court]
  • May 16, 2017: [Presentence Investigation Report]
April, 2017
  • April 24, 2017: [Continue]
March, 2017
  • March 24, 2017: [Continue]
  • March 24, 2017: [Sentencing]
February, 2017
  • February 24, 2017: [Continue]
  • February 02, 2017: [Order on Motion for Bond]
January, 2017
  • January 11, 2017: [Bond]
December, 2016
  • December 06, 2016: [Notice of Assignment (Probation)]
  • December 01, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
  • December 01, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • December 01, 2016: [~Util - Plea Entered]
November, 2016
  • November 17, 2016: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • November 17, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 15, 2016: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
  • November 01, 2016: [Order]
September, 2016
  • September 14, 2016: [Trial Order]
  • September 14, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • September 14, 2016: [Continue]
  • September 09, 2016: [Notice of Calendar Setting]
  • September 09, 2016: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • September 02, 2016: [Digital Audio File]
August, 2016
  • August 30, 2016: [Notice of Assignment (Probation)]
  • August 30, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • August 30, 2016: [Waiver]
  • August 30, 2016: [Trial Order]
  • August 30, 2016: [Order Regarding Discovery]
  • August 30, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • August 30, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • August 30, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • August 30, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • August 25, 2016: [Notice of Hearing]
  • August 24, 2016: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • August 24, 2016: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • August 23, 2016: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • August 23, 2016: [Unseal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.