U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:16-cr-00063-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Bass
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2019
  • September 23, 2019: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • September 17, 2019: [Withdraw as Attorney]
July, 2017
  • July 05, 2017: [Judgment]
  • July 05, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
June, 2017
  • June 27, 2017: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • June 27, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • June 27, 2017: [Digital Audio File]
February, 2017
  • February 27, 2017: [Notice of Assignment (Probation)]
  • February 27, 2017: [Order for Forfeiture of Property]
  • February 27, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
  • February 27, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • February 27, 2017: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • February 27, 2017: [Digital Audio File]
  • February 24, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • February 13, 2017: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
January, 2017
  • January 26, 2017: [Digital Audio File]
  • January 13, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • January 12, 2017: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • January 12, 2017: [Continue]
  • January 04, 2017: [Order]
November, 2016
  • November 29, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 29, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • November 28, 2016: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • November 28, 2016: [Continue]
  • November 14, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • November 10, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
  • November 09, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 08, 2016: [Order of Temporary Detention]
  • November 08, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • November 08, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • November 08, 2016: [Order Regarding Discovery]
  • November 08, 2016: [Trial Order]
  • November 08, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • November 08, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • November 07, 2016: [Warrant Returned Executed]
August, 2016
  • August 23, 2016: [Praecipe for Warrant]
  • August 23, 2016: [Restricted Document]
  • August 23, 2016: [Indictment - Redacted]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.