U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:16-cr-00062-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Luster
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2019
  • September 23, 2019: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • September 17, 2019: [Withdraw as Attorney]
October, 2016
  • October 07, 2016: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • October 07, 2016: [Dismiss]
  • October 05, 2016: [Rebuttal]
September, 2016
  • September 29, 2016: [Docket Annotation]
  • September 29, 2016: [Response]
  • September 29, 2016: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • September 26, 2016: [Notice of Conventional Filing]
  • September 23, 2016: [Suppress]
  • September 22, 2016: [Dismiss/Speedy Trial]
  • September 22, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 09, 2016: [Digital Audio File]
  • September 07, 2016: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • September 06, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • September 06, 2016: [Order Regarding Discovery]
  • September 06, 2016: [Trial Order]
August, 2016
  • August 25, 2016: [Praecipe for Summons]
  • August 25, 2016: [Restricted Document]
  • August 25, 2016: [Notice of Judicial Assignment]
  • August 25, 2016: [Indictment - Redacted]
  • August 24, 2016: [Transcript (DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS)]
  • August 24, 2016: [Praecipe for Summons]
  • August 24, 2016: [Restricted Document]
  • August 24, 2016: [Notice of Judicial Assignment]
  • August 24, 2016: [Indictment - Redacted]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.