U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:16-cr-00061-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Sam
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2018
  • January 02, 2018: [Digital Audio File]
August, 2017
  • August 10, 2017: [Judgment]
  • August 10, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • August 07, 2017: [Sealed Document]
  • August 07, 2017: [Attachment]
  • August 07, 2017: [Letter]
  • August 07, 2017: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • August 07, 2017: [Digital Audio File (SEALED)]
  • August 07, 2017: [Digital Audio File]
June, 2017
  • June 13, 2017: [Sentencing]
May, 2017
  • May 03, 2017: [Order]
February, 2017
  • February 28, 2017: [Digital Audio File]
  • February 28, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • February 28, 2017: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • February 21, 2017: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • February 17, 2017: [Telephone Conference]
January, 2017
  • January 20, 2017: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • January 19, 2017: [Pretrial Conference]
  • January 19, 2017: [Amend/Correct]
  • January 04, 2017: [Order]
October, 2016
  • October 26, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • October 19, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • October 14, 2016: [Continue]
  • October 03, 2016: [Order of Detention]
September, 2016
  • September 20, 2016: [Digital Audio File]
  • September 20, 2016: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • September 20, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
  • September 16, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 16, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • September 16, 2016: [Continue]
  • September 15, 2016: [Order Regarding Discovery]
  • September 15, 2016: [Trial Order]
  • September 15, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • September 15, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • September 15, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • September 15, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • September 15, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
August, 2016
  • August 24, 2016: [Restricted Document]
  • August 24, 2016: [Praecipe for Warrant]
  • August 24, 2016: [Indictment - Redacted]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.