U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:15-cr-00011-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Hill
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 09, 2025: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • April 09, 2025: [Order of Detention]
  • April 09, 2025: [Waiver of Preliminary Examination or Hearing]
  • April 09, 2025: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • April 09, 2025: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 09, 2025: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • April 09, 2025: [Order to Unseal Document]
  • April 09, 2025: [Warrant Returned Executed]
June, 2021
  • June 28, 2021: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
May, 2020
  • May 29, 2020: [Docket Annotation]
  • May 29, 2020: [Letter]
  • May 29, 2020: [Change of Address]
October, 2019
  • October 21, 2019: [Appoint Counsel]
September, 2019
  • September 23, 2019: [Letter]
January, 2019
  • January 02, 2019: [Letter]
August, 2017
  • August 28, 2017: [Letter]
May, 2017
  • May 05, 2017: [Order for Forfeiture of Property]
  • May 03, 2017: [Forfeiture of Property]
March, 2017
  • March 09, 2017: [Judgment]
  • March 09, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • March 07, 2017: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • March 07, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • March 06, 2017: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
January, 2017
  • January 19, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
December, 2016
  • December 02, 2016: [Order for Forfeiture of Property]
  • December 01, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
  • December 01, 2016: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • December 01, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • December 01, 2016: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
November, 2016
  • November 28, 2016: [Notice of Hearing]
  • November 28, 2016: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
October, 2016
  • October 03, 2016: [Trial Order]
  • October 03, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 03, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue]
September, 2016
  • September 28, 2016: [Continue]
  • September 09, 2016: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • September 09, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • September 09, 2016: [Trial Order]
  • September 09, 2016: [Waiver]
  • September 09, 2016: [Order Regarding Discovery]
  • September 09, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • September 09, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • September 09, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • September 09, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
August, 2016
  • August 24, 2016: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • August 24, 2016: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.