U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:07-cr-00060-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Bolden
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2016
  • September 13, 2016: [Statement of Reasons]
  • September 12, 2016: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • September 08, 2016: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
August, 2016
  • August 26, 2016: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • August 25, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 25, 2016: [Waiver]
  • August 25, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • August 25, 2016: [Waiver of Preliminary Examination or Hearing]
  • August 25, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • August 25, 2016: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • August 24, 2016: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • August 24, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.