U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:16-cr-00064-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Mason
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
February, 2018
  • February 14, 2018: [Judgment Returned Executed]
  • February 12, 2018: [Letter]
March, 2017
  • March 22, 2017: [Digital Audio File]
  • March 03, 2017: [Judgment]
February, 2017
  • February 23, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • February 23, 2017: [Presentence Investigation Report]
December, 2016
  • December 15, 2016: [Notice of Assignment (Probation)]
  • December 15, 2016: [Digital Audio File]
  • December 15, 2016: [Order]
  • December 15, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
  • December 15, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • December 15, 2016: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 15, 2016: [~Util - Plea Entered]
November, 2016
  • November 18, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
October, 2016
  • October 13, 2016: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • October 12, 2016: [Waiver]
  • October 12, 2016: [Order Regarding Discovery]
  • October 12, 2016: [Trial Order]
  • October 12, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • October 12, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • October 12, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • October 12, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • October 12, 2016: [Digital Audio File]
September, 2016
  • September 15, 2016: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • September 15, 2016: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
August, 2016
  • August 24, 2016: [Restricted Document]
  • August 24, 2016: [Praecipe for Warrant]
  • August 24, 2016: [Indictment - Redacted]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.