U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:16-cr-00060-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Henry
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2019
  • September 23, 2019: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • September 17, 2019: [Withdraw as Attorney]
August, 2017
  • August 14, 2017: [Restricted Document]
April, 2017
  • April 20, 2017: [Order For Restitution]
February, 2017
  • February 22, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • February 01, 2017: [Judgment]
January, 2017
  • January 31, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • January 26, 2017: [Sealed Document]
  • January 23, 2017: [Digital Audio File]
  • January 19, 2017: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • January 19, 2017: [Dismiss]
  • January 19, 2017: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • January 19, 2017: [Sentencing]
December, 2016
  • December 14, 2016: [Digital Audio File]
November, 2016
  • November 14, 2016: [Notice of Assignment (Probation)]
  • November 10, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
  • November 10, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • November 10, 2016: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • November 10, 2016: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
October, 2016
  • October 04, 2016: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
September, 2016
  • September 28, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 13, 2016: [Digital Audio File]
  • September 09, 2016: [Digital Audio File]
  • September 08, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 07, 2016: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • September 06, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • September 06, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • September 06, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • September 06, 2016: [Waiver]
  • September 06, 2016: [Trial Order]
  • September 06, 2016: [Order Regarding Discovery]
  • September 06, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • September 06, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
August, 2016
  • August 26, 2016: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • August 26, 2016: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • August 24, 2016: [Praecipe for Warrant]
  • August 24, 2016: [Indictment - Redacted]
  • August 24, 2016: [Restricted Document]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.