U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:14-cr-00014-2
  • Case Name: USA v. Norman et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 12, 2023: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 15, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
October, 2022
  • October 24, 2022: [Answer to Writ of Garnishment]
  • October 06, 2022: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
  • October 03, 2022: [Order]
September, 2022
  • September 30, 2022: [Clerk's Notice Issued]
  • September 30, 2022: [Writ Issued]
  • September 30, 2022: [Remark]
  • September 30, 2022: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • September 30, 2022: [Application for Writ]
  • September 30, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
June, 2017
  • June 21, 2017: [Order]
  • June 21, 2017: [Order on Motion to Vacate (2255)]
  • June 19, 2017: [Evidentiary Hearing]
  • June 14, 2017: [Transcript (DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS)]
  • June 09, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
May, 2017
  • May 10, 2017: [Letter]
  • May 04, 2017: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • May 03, 2017: [Order on Motion to Vacate (2255)]
April, 2017
  • April 13, 2017: [Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney]
  • April 13, 2017: [Substitute Attorney]
February, 2017
  • February 27, 2017: [Response]
January, 2017
  • January 26, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • January 24, 2017: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • January 06, 2017: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
December, 2016
  • December 19, 2016: [Order on Motion to Produce]
  • December 19, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • December 15, 2016: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • December 15, 2016: [Produce]
November, 2016
  • November 22, 2016: [Order to Show Cause]
October, 2016
  • October 03, 2016: [Order]
August, 2016
  • August 24, 2016: [Vacate (2255) * FILE CONVENTIONALLY *]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.