U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cr-00063-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Mendoza-Sanchez
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2018
  • January 12, 2018: [Digital Audio File]
December, 2017
  • December 21, 2017: [Digital Audio File]
December, 2016
  • December 28, 2016: [Amended Judgment]
  • December 21, 2016: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • December 21, 2016: [Dismiss]
  • December 21, 2016: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property]
  • December 21, 2016: [Order on Motion to Alter Judgment]
  • December 20, 2016: [Forfeiture of Property]
  • December 20, 2016: [Alter Judgment]
  • December 20, 2016: [Judgment]
  • December 20, 2016: [Statement of Reasons]
  • December 16, 2016: [Statement of Reasons]
  • December 15, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • December 15, 2016: [Sentencing]
September, 2016
  • September 23, 2016: [Notice of Assignment (Probation)]
  • September 21, 2016: [Order]
  • September 21, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
  • September 21, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • September 21, 2016: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • September 09, 2016: [Docket Annotation]
  • September 09, 2016: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • September 09, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 09, 2016: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
  • September 08, 2016: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • September 02, 2016: [Digital Audio File]
August, 2016
  • August 30, 2016: [Trial Order]
  • August 30, 2016: [Order Regarding Discovery]
  • August 30, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • August 30, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • August 25, 2016: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • August 25, 2016: [Praecipe for Summons]
  • August 25, 2016: [Restricted Document]
  • August 25, 2016: [Indictment - Redacted]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.