U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:12-cr-00053-3
  • Case Name: USA v. Armstrong et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
February, 2022
  • February 18, 2022: [Order on Motion for Early Termination of Probation or Supervised Release]
  • February 09, 2022: [Early Termination of Probation or Supervised Release]
January, 2022
  • January 27, 2022: [Order on Motion for Early Termination of Probation]
  • January 25, 2022: [Early Termination of Probation]
April, 2021
  • April 13, 2021: [Order on Motion for Early Termination of Probation]
  • April 01, 2021: [Change of Address]
  • April 01, 2021: [Early Termination of Probation]
November, 2020
  • November 12, 2020: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • November 12, 2020: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
October, 2020
  • October 05, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • October 05, 2020: [Continue]
September, 2020
  • September 14, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 14, 2020: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 14, 2020: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • September 11, 2020: [Order of Detention]
  • September 11, 2020: [Order on Motion to Unseal Document]
  • September 11, 2020: [Waiver of Preliminary Examination or Hearing]
  • September 11, 2020: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • September 11, 2020: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • September 11, 2020: [Unseal Document]
  • September 11, 2020: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • September 10, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
September, 2019
  • September 10, 2019: [Order on Petition re: Probation/Supervised Release (12B)]
February, 2019
  • February 27, 2019: [Order]
August, 2018
  • August 07, 2018: [Order]
April, 2017
  • April 04, 2017: [Order on Petition re: Probation/Supervised Release (12B)]
March, 2017
  • March 27, 2017: [Order on Petition re: Probation/Supervised Release (12B)]
February, 2017
  • February 16, 2017: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • February 16, 2017: [Trial/Hearing Exhibit - Government]
  • February 16, 2017: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • February 15, 2017: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • February 14, 2017: [Waiver of Preliminary Examination or Hearing]
  • February 14, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • February 14, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • February 14, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • February 14, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • February 14, 2017: [Order on Motion to Unseal Document]
  • February 14, 2017: [Unseal Document]
  • February 13, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 06, 2017: [Notice of Hearing]
January, 2017
  • January 10, 2017: [Satisfaction of Judgment]
December, 2016
  • December 21, 2016: [Answer to Writ of Garnishment]
October, 2016
  • October 27, 2016: [Answer to Writ of Garnishment]
September, 2016
  • September 06, 2016: [Answer to Writ of Garnishment]
August, 2016
  • August 29, 2016: [Writ Issued]
  • August 29, 2016: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
  • August 25, 2016: [Application for Writ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.