U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cr-00061-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Lepre
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2020
  • June 29, 2020: [Order on Petition re: Probation/Supervised Release (12B)]
January, 2020
  • January 13, 2020: [Mail Returned]
December, 2019
  • December 16, 2019: [Order on Motion to Vacate (2255)]
  • December 16, 2019: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 06, 2019: [Vacate (2255) * FILE CONVENTIONALLY *]
  • December 06, 2019: [Order]
July, 2019
  • July 20, 2019: [Response in Opposition]
June, 2019
  • June 28, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 26, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • June 24, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
April, 2019
  • April 08, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
February, 2019
  • February 04, 2019: [Letter]
  • February 01, 2019: [Certified Copy of USCA Judgment/Mandate]
January, 2019
  • January 07, 2019: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
December, 2018
  • December 20, 2018: [Order on Motion for Recusal]
  • December 17, 2018: [Recusal]
  • December 11, 2018: [Order on Motion to Vacate (2255)]
  • December 10, 2018: [Vacate (2255) * FILE CONVENTIONALLY *]
April, 2018
  • April 17, 2018: [Judgment]
  • April 16, 2018: [Restricted Document]
  • April 13, 2018: [Digital Audio File (SEALED)]
  • April 12, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • April 12, 2018: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • April 12, 2018: [Sentencing]
February, 2018
  • February 22, 2018: [Continue]
January, 2018
  • January 24, 2018: [Continue]
  • January 16, 2018: [Digital Audio File]
October, 2017
  • October 25, 2017: [Order]
August, 2017
  • August 21, 2017: [Notice of Assignment (Probation)]
  • August 18, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
  • August 18, 2017: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • August 18, 2017: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • August 18, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • August 18, 2017: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 14, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 14, 2017: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
July, 2017
  • July 31, 2017: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
June, 2017
  • June 26, 2017: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 23, 2017: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • June 21, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 15, 2017: [Order on Motion for Bill of Particulars]
  • June 15, 2017: [Attachment]
  • June 14, 2017: [Extension of Time to File Document]
  • June 14, 2017: [Continue]
  • June 14, 2017: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • June 09, 2017: [Response in Opposition]
  • June 08, 2017: [Response in Opposition]
  • June 02, 2017: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
May, 2017
  • May 22, 2017: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • May 19, 2017: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • May 15, 2017: [Bill of Particulars]
  • May 15, 2017: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • May 15, 2017: [Dismiss]
February, 2017
  • February 01, 2017: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
January, 2017
  • January 31, 2017: [Docket Annotation]
  • January 31, 2017: [Continue]
  • January 31, 2017: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • January 31, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
December, 2016
  • December 08, 2016: [Continue]
November, 2016
  • November 28, 2016: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
October, 2016
  • October 18, 2016: [Trial Order]
  • October 18, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • October 17, 2016: [Continue]
September, 2016
  • September 30, 2016: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
  • September 23, 2016: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • September 22, 2016: [Digital Audio File]
  • September 22, 2016: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • September 22, 2016: [Bond]
  • September 22, 2016: [Order Regarding Discovery]
  • September 22, 2016: [Trial Order]
  • September 22, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • September 22, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • September 22, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • September 22, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • September 22, 2016: [Notice of Assignment (Probation)]
August, 2016
  • August 30, 2016: [Notice of Hearing]
  • August 25, 2016: [Praecipe for Warrant]
  • August 25, 2016: [Restricted Document]
  • August 25, 2016: [Indictment - Redacted]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.