U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cr-00064-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Dixon
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 17, 2025: [Judgment]
  • April 17, 2025: [Statement of Reasons]
  • April 15, 2025: [Notice of Assignment (Probation)]
  • April 15, 2025: [Plea Agreement]
  • April 15, 2025: [Judgment]
  • April 15, 2025: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • April 15, 2025: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • April 15, 2025: [Statement of Reasons]
  • April 11, 2025: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • April 11, 2025: [Sentencing]
  • April 09, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 09, 2025: [Order on Motion to Expedite]
  • April 09, 2025: [Docket Annotation]
  • April 09, 2025: [Expedite]
  • April 08, 2025: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • April 08, 2025: [Sentencing]
  • April 08, 2025: [Trial/Hearing Exhibit]
  • April 07, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • April 07, 2025: [Continue]
  • April 07, 2025: [Order on Motion to Unseal Document]
  • April 07, 2025: [Order of Detention]
  • April 07, 2025: [Waiver of Preliminary Examination or Hearing]
  • April 07, 2025: [Unseal Document]
  • April 07, 2025: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • April 07, 2025: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
  • April 07, 2025: [Sentencing]
  • April 07, 2025: [Presentence Investigation Report]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 26, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 26, 2025: [Judgment]
  • March 26, 2025: [Statement of Reasons]
  • March 24, 2025: [Judgment]
  • March 24, 2025: [Statement of Reasons]
  • March 21, 2025: [Trial Order]
  • March 21, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • March 20, 2025: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • March 18, 2025: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • March 18, 2025: [Sentencing]
  • March 18, 2025: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • March 18, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 18, 2025: [Order]
  • March 18, 2025: [Order on Motion to Unseal Document]
  • March 18, 2025: [Unseal Document]
  • March 18, 2025: [Bond Hearing]
  • March 18, 2025: [Notice of Intent To Change Plea To Guilty]
  • March 17, 2025: [Docket Annotation]
  • March 17, 2025: [Continue]
  • March 17, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 14, 2025: [Docket Annotation]
  • March 14, 2025: [Continue]
  • March 14, 2025: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • March 14, 2025: [Sentencing]
  • March 11, 2025: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • March 11, 2025: [Sentencing]
January, 2025
  • January 17, 2025: [Order]
March, 2021
  • March 26, 2021: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • March 24, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • March 22, 2021: [Trial/Hearing Exhibit]
  • March 15, 2021: [Order on Motion to Unseal Document]
  • March 15, 2021: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • March 15, 2021: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
  • March 09, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • March 09, 2021: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
  • March 05, 2021: [Order on Motion to Unseal Document]
  • March 05, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • March 05, 2021: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • March 04, 2021: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • March 02, 2021: [Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney]
February, 2021
  • February 24, 2021: [Remark]
  • February 23, 2021: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • February 23, 2021: [Notice of Assignment (Probation)]
August, 2019
  • August 30, 2019: [Letter]
October, 2018
  • October 26, 2018: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • October 25, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • October 19, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • October 19, 2018: [Waiver of Preliminary Examination or Hearing]
  • October 19, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • October 19, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • October 19, 2018: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • October 19, 2018: [Order on Motion to Unseal Document]
  • October 19, 2018: [Order on Petition for Warrant/Summons (12C)]
July, 2017
  • July 28, 2017: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • July 28, 2017: [Trial/Hearing Exhibit]
  • July 14, 2017: [Letter]
June, 2017
  • June 08, 2017: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • June 08, 2017: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • June 08, 2017: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • June 06, 2017: [Withdraw as Attorney]
May, 2017
  • May 18, 2017: [Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney]
  • May 18, 2017: [Substitute Attorney]
  • May 18, 2017: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • May 18, 2017: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • May 18, 2017: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • May 18, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • May 18, 2017: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • May 18, 2017: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 18, 2017: [Continue]
  • May 17, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • May 17, 2017: [Order on Motion for Bond]
  • May 17, 2017: [Waiver of Preliminary Examination or Hearing]
  • May 17, 2017: [Preliminary Hearing]
  • May 15, 2017: [Response in Opposition]
  • May 12, 2017: [Bond]
  • May 12, 2017: [Order on Motion to Unseal Document]
  • May 12, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • May 12, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • May 12, 2017: [Unseal Document]
  • May 12, 2017: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • May 11, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 11, 2017: [Notice of Hearing]
August, 2016
  • August 25, 2016: [Case Inquiry Report]
  • August 25, 2016: [Transfer In/Supervised Release]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.