U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:15-cr-00056-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Benitez-Mendoza
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 23, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • September 12, 2022: [Remark]
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: [Remark]
  • August 31, 2022: [Transfer Out/Supervised Release]
December, 2018
  • December 12, 2018: [Letter]
July, 2018
  • July 23, 2018: [Certified Copy of USCA Judgment/Mandate]
June, 2018
  • June 15, 2018: [Remark]
  • June 14, 2018: [Order]
  • June 12, 2018: [Vacate (2255) * FILE CONVENTIONALLY *]
  • June 08, 2018: [Certified Copy of USCA Judgment/Mandate]
November, 2017
  • November 29, 2017: [USCA Order]
October, 2017
  • October 20, 2017: [Certified Copy of USCA Judgment/Mandate]
August, 2017
  • August 23, 2017: [Electronic Record on Appeal Accepted]
  • August 10, 2017: [Appeal Remark]
July, 2017
  • July 26, 2017: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
  • July 17, 2017: [Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
June, 2017
  • June 28, 2017: [USCA Case Number]
  • June 28, 2017: [Appeal Remark]
  • June 19, 2017: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • June 07, 2017: [Certificate of Appealability]
  • June 07, 2017: [Order on Motion to Vacate (2255)]
  • June 05, 2017: [Response]
May, 2017
  • May 05, 2017: [Response]
April, 2017
  • April 17, 2017: [Change of Address]
  • April 05, 2017: [Order]
September, 2016
  • September 23, 2016: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • September 23, 2016: [Vacate (2255) * FILE CONVENTIONALLY *]
  • September 14, 2016: [Letter]
August, 2016
  • August 25, 2016: [Certified Copy of USCA Judgment/Mandate]
  • August 25, 2016: [Copy of Opinion - USCA]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.