U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cr-00062-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Villalobos-Chavez et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2018
  • January 14, 2018: [Digital Audio File]
September, 2017
  • September 06, 2017: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 05, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
February, 2017
  • February 24, 2017: [Judgment]
  • February 23, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • February 22, 2017: [Trial/Hearing Exhibit - Defendant]
  • February 22, 2017: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • February 22, 2017: [Sentencing]
December, 2016
  • December 02, 2016: [Digital Audio File]
November, 2016
  • November 23, 2016: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • November 23, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
  • November 23, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • November 23, 2016: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • November 22, 2016: [Amend/Correct]
  • November 18, 2016: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • November 17, 2016: [Docket Annotation]
  • November 17, 2016: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • November 15, 2016: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
  • November 01, 2016: [Order]
September, 2016
  • September 09, 2016: [Trial Order]
  • September 09, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • September 09, 2016: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • September 09, 2016: [Continue]
  • September 01, 2016: [Digital Audio File]
August, 2016
  • August 30, 2016: [Order Regarding Discovery]
  • August 30, 2016: [Trial Order]
  • August 30, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • August 30, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • August 25, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 25, 2016: [Praecipe for Summons]
  • August 25, 2016: [Restricted Document]
  • August 25, 2016: [Indictment - Redacted]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.