U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:15-cr-00004-2
  • Case Name: USA v. Taylor et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 17, 2022: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • October 17, 2022: [Order of Recusal]
  • October 14, 2022: [Add and Terminate Judges]
November, 2021
  • November 29, 2021: [Order on Motion for Early Termination of Probation]
October, 2021
  • October 13, 2021: [Early Termination of Probation]
  • October 06, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
January, 2021
  • January 21, 2021: [Remark]
  • January 08, 2021: [Remark]
October, 2019
  • October 28, 2019: [Notice of Assignment (Probation)]
August, 2019
  • August 29, 2019: [Transcript (DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS)]
June, 2019
  • June 18, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
March, 2019
  • March 18, 2019: [Mail Returned]
  • March 05, 2019: [Judgment - 2255]
  • March 05, 2019: [Order on Motion to Vacate (2255)]
February, 2019
  • February 28, 2019: [Evidentiary Hearing]
January, 2019
  • January 24, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • January 22, 2019: [Continue]
  • January 08, 2019: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • January 02, 2019: [Modify Conditions of Release]
November, 2018
  • November 20, 2018: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • November 20, 2018: [Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney]
  • November 20, 2018: [Substitute Attorney]
  • November 19, 2018: [Order]
  • November 19, 2018: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 09, 2018: [Response]
September, 2018
  • September 27, 2018: [Certificate of Service]
  • September 26, 2018: [Response in Opposition]
  • September 05, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • September 04, 2018: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
August, 2018
  • August 06, 2018: [Affidavit]
July, 2018
  • July 23, 2018: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • July 23, 2018: [Seal Document]
June, 2018
  • June 21, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • June 21, 2018: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 18, 2018: [Docket Annotation]
  • June 15, 2018: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
May, 2018
  • May 15, 2018: [Order]
April, 2018
  • April 30, 2018: [Vacate (2255) * FILE CONVENTIONALLY *]
  • April 13, 2018: [Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney]
November, 2017
  • November 27, 2017: [Judgment]
  • November 27, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • November 27, 2017: [Docket Annotation]
  • November 02, 2017: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • November 02, 2017: [Sentencing]
October, 2017
  • October 16, 2017: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • October 12, 2017: [Order Reassigning Case]
August, 2017
  • August 29, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
July, 2017
  • July 20, 2017: [Judgment]
  • July 20, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • July 20, 2017: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • July 20, 2017: [Dismiss]
  • July 20, 2017: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • July 20, 2017: [Sentencing]
April, 2017
  • April 12, 2017: [Digital Audio File]
  • April 11, 2017: [Notice of Assignment (Probation)]
  • April 11, 2017: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • April 11, 2017: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 11, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
March, 2017
  • March 28, 2017: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • March 28, 2017: [Dismiss]
  • March 28, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
February, 2017
  • February 27, 2017: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
November, 2016
  • November 29, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 29, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • November 29, 2016: [Continue]
September, 2016
  • September 12, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • September 06, 2016: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
  • September 06, 2016: [Continue]
August, 2016
  • August 25, 2016: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.