U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:03-cr-00176-2
  • Case Name: USA v. Scott et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2021
  • January 13, 2021: [Letter]
November, 2020
  • November 30, 2020: [Judgment - 2255]
  • November 30, 2020: [Order on Motion to Vacate (2255)]
  • November 24, 2020: [Response in Opposition]
  • November 19, 2020: [Affidavit]
October, 2020
  • October 21, 2020: [Transcript (DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS)]
  • October 14, 2020: [Affidavit]
September, 2020
  • September 18, 2020: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 18, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • September 08, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • September 08, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 01, 2020: [Order on Motion to Vacate (2255)]
  • September 01, 2020: [Letter]
August, 2020
  • August 31, 2020: [Response to Order]
  • August 06, 2020: [Vacate (2255) * FILE CONVENTIONALLY *]
December, 2019
  • December 30, 2019: [Judgment]
  • December 30, 2019: [Statement of Reasons]
  • December 11, 2019: [Digital Audio File]
  • December 06, 2019: [Order]
  • December 06, 2019: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • December 06, 2019: [Sentencing]
September, 2019
  • September 12, 2019: [Notice of Assignment (Probation)]
  • September 08, 2019: [Digital Audio File]
  • September 06, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • September 06, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
August, 2019
  • August 30, 2019: [Notice of Intent To Change Plea To Guilty]
  • August 16, 2019: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • August 07, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
July, 2019
  • July 26, 2019: [Notice of Intent To Change Plea To Guilty]
June, 2019
  • June 28, 2019: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 27, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • June 14, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • June 13, 2019: [Motion Hearing]
May, 2019
  • May 21, 2019: [Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
April, 2019
  • April 30, 2019: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • April 29, 2019: [Reply to Response]
  • April 23, 2019: [Response]
  • April 12, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 05, 2019: [Status Conference]
March, 2019
  • March 29, 2019: [Continue]
  • March 28, 2019: [Response in Opposition]
  • March 28, 2019: [Continue]
  • March 27, 2019: [Discovery]
  • March 27, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
February, 2019
  • February 15, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • February 11, 2019: [Continue]
January, 2019
  • January 02, 2019: [Order]
  • January 02, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
December, 2018
  • December 18, 2018: [Order]
  • December 14, 2018: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • December 14, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • December 13, 2018: [Continue]
  • December 13, 2018: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
  • December 12, 2018: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
November, 2018
  • November 09, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 08, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue]
October, 2018
  • October 31, 2018: [Continue]
  • October 05, 2018: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • October 05, 2018: [Order]
September, 2018
  • September 26, 2018: [Notice of Hearing]
  • September 20, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • September 20, 2018: [Digital Audio File]
  • September 20, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • September 20, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • September 20, 2018: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • September 20, 2018: [Order Regarding Discovery]
  • September 20, 2018: [Trial Order]
  • September 20, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • September 20, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • September 19, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • September 11, 2018: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • September 11, 2018: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • September 11, 2018: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • September 10, 2018: [Praecipe for Warrant]
  • September 10, 2018: [Restricted Document]
  • September 10, 2018: [Indictment - Redacted]
September, 2016
  • September 07, 2016: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
August, 2016
  • August 26, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.