U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:16-cr-00066-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Holguin
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2016
  • December 20, 2016: [Judgment]
  • December 20, 2016: [Statement of Reasons]
  • December 12, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • December 12, 2016: [Docket Annotation]
  • December 12, 2016: [Sentencing]
October, 2016
  • October 17, 2016: [Digital Audio File]
September, 2016
  • September 23, 2016: [Digital Audio File]
  • September 21, 2016: [Notice of Assignment (Probation)]
  • September 21, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
  • September 21, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • September 21, 2016: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • September 21, 2016: [Order]
  • September 21, 2016: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • September 21, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • September 21, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • September 15, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 07, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
August, 2016
  • August 30, 2016: [Praecipe for Summons]
  • August 30, 2016: [Notice of Judicial Assignment]
  • August 30, 2016: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.