U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:16-cr-00067-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Davis
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2016
  • December 14, 2016: [Docket Annotation]
  • December 14, 2016: [Judgment]
  • December 08, 2016: [Digital Audio File]
  • December 08, 2016: [Sentencing]
October, 2016
  • October 17, 2016: [Digital Audio File]
September, 2016
  • September 22, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • September 22, 2016: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • September 22, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • September 22, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • September 16, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 01, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
August, 2016
  • August 30, 2016: [Praecipe for Summons]
  • August 30, 2016: [Notice of Judicial Assignment]
  • August 30, 2016: [Information - ALL Misdemeanor]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.