U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:12-cr-00045-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Robbins
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2017
  • September 25, 2017: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • September 21, 2017: [Trial/Hearing Exhibit]
  • September 19, 2017: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • September 08, 2017: [Order on Motion to Unseal Document]
  • September 07, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • September 07, 2017: [Waiver of Preliminary Examination or Hearing]
  • September 07, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • September 07, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • September 07, 2017: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
June, 2017
  • June 15, 2017: [Order on Petition re: Probation/Supervised Release (12B)]
May, 2017
  • May 31, 2017: [Order on Petition re: Probation/Supervised Release (12B)]
October, 2016
  • October 06, 2016: [Judgment Returned Executed]
September, 2016
  • September 08, 2016: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • September 07, 2016: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • September 01, 2016: [Trial/Hearing Exhibit - Court]
  • September 01, 2016: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
August, 2016
  • August 30, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 30, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • August 30, 2016: [Waiver of Preliminary Examination or Hearing]
  • August 30, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • August 30, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • August 30, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • August 30, 2016: [Order on Motion to Unseal Document]
  • August 30, 2016: [Unseal Document]
  • August 30, 2016: [Notice of Hearing]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.