U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:16-cr-00068-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Bolton
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2019
  • March 14, 2019: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • March 08, 2019: [Exhibit List]
  • March 08, 2019: [Exhibit (Document)]
  • March 08, 2019: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
February, 2019
  • February 22, 2019: [Order of Temporary Detention]
  • February 22, 2019: [Waiver of Preliminary Examination or Hearing]
  • February 22, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • February 22, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • February 22, 2019: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
November, 2017
  • November 08, 2017: [Waiver of Preliminary Examination or Hearing]
  • November 08, 2017: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • November 03, 2017: [Notice of Assignment (Probation)]
  • November 03, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 03, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • November 03, 2017: [Continue]
  • November 02, 2017: [Warrant Returned Executed]
August, 2016
  • August 31, 2016: [Transfer In/Supervised Release]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.