U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:16-cr-00069-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Cotton
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2021
  • November 04, 2021: [Judgment on Revocation]
October, 2021
  • October 21, 2021: [Consent By Videoconference]
September, 2021
  • September 30, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 29, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • September 29, 2021: [Order of Temporary Detention]
  • September 29, 2021: [Waiver of Preliminary Examination or Hearing]
  • September 29, 2021: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • September 29, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • September 29, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • September 29, 2021: [Consent By Videoconference]
  • September 22, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • September 22, 2021: [Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received]
August, 2021
  • August 19, 2021: [Add and Terminate Judges]
October, 2020
  • October 13, 2020: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • October 09, 2020: [Consent By Videoconference]
  • October 08, 2020: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • October 05, 2020: [Order of Temporary Detention]
  • October 05, 2020: [Waiver of Preliminary Examination or Hearing]
  • October 05, 2020: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
September, 2020
  • September 28, 2020: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • September 28, 2020: [Consent By Videoconference]
  • September 28, 2020: [Order]
  • September 28, 2020: [Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney]
  • September 24, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • September 22, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
February, 2020
  • February 06, 2020: [Order on Petition re: Probation/Supervised Release (12B)]
August, 2019
  • August 14, 2019: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • August 09, 2019: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • August 09, 2019: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • August 06, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • August 05, 2019: [Order on Motion for Disclosure]
  • August 05, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • August 02, 2019: [Disclosure]
July, 2019
  • July 11, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • July 08, 2019: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • July 08, 2019: [Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney]
  • July 08, 2019: [Substitute Attorney]
  • July 08, 2019: [Order of Temporary Detention]
  • July 08, 2019: [Waiver of Preliminary Examination or Hearing]
  • July 08, 2019: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • July 08, 2019: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • July 08, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
November, 2018
  • November 14, 2018: [Notice of Assignment (Probation)]
June, 2017
  • June 01, 2017: [Digital Audio File]
April, 2017
  • April 24, 2017: [Judgment]
  • April 24, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • April 12, 2017: [Digital Audio File]
  • April 11, 2017: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • April 11, 2017: [Sentencing]
December, 2016
  • December 09, 2016: [Restricted Document]
November, 2016
  • November 18, 2016: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • November 17, 2016: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • November 17, 2016: [Order]
  • November 17, 2016: [Sealed Motion]
  • November 17, 2016: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document]
  • November 16, 2016: [Leave to File Document]
October, 2016
  • October 17, 2016: [Transcript (DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS)]
September, 2016
  • September 12, 2016: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • September 09, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • September 09, 2016: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • September 09, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
  • September 09, 2016: [Digital Audio File]
  • September 06, 2016: [Order]
  • September 06, 2016: [Waiver]
  • September 06, 2016: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • September 06, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • September 06, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • September 01, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 01, 2016: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
August, 2016
  • August 31, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 31, 2016: [Praecipe for Summons]
  • August 31, 2016: [Notice of Judicial Assignment]
  • August 31, 2016: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.