U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:01-cr-00162-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Ayala
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2021
  • August 24, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • August 16, 2021: [Order on Motion for Compassionate Release (COVID-19)]
  • August 16, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • August 16, 2021: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
February, 2021
  • February 19, 2021: [Response to Motion]
  • February 08, 2021: [Reconsideration]
November, 2020
  • November 20, 2020: [Rebuttal]
  • November 03, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
October, 2020
  • October 30, 2020: [Restricted Document]
  • October 30, 2020: [Notice of Conventional Filing]
  • October 30, 2020: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • October 30, 2020: [Response in Opposition]
  • October 19, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 14, 2020: [CJA Appointment Order]
  • October 14, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • October 14, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • October 09, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • October 05, 2020: [Order]
  • October 05, 2020: [Compassionate Release (COVID-19)]
  • October 05, 2020: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
December, 2017
  • December 15, 2017: [Order on Motion to Vacate (2255)]
August, 2017
  • August 21, 2017: [Vacate (2255) * FILE CONVENTIONALLY *]
August, 2016
  • August 31, 2016: [Restricted Document]
  • August 31, 2016: [Order Reducing Sentence - USSC Amendment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.