U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:12-cr-00016-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Hall et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2021
  • July 02, 2021: [Unclaimed Exhibits Destroyed]
April, 2021
  • April 22, 2021: [Notice of Disposal of Trial Exhibits]
June, 2018
  • June 26, 2018: [Notice of Assignment (Probation)]
July, 2017
  • July 21, 2017: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
May, 2017
  • May 15, 2017: [Notice of Assignment (Probation)]
December, 2016
  • December 06, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
November, 2016
  • November 03, 2016: [Letter]
September, 2016
  • September 01, 2016: [Letter]
August, 2016
  • August 31, 2016: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 31, 2016: [Order on Motion to Clarify]
  • August 31, 2016: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.