U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cr-00023-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Hayes
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2017
  • May 31, 2017: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • May 31, 2017: [Dismiss]
  • May 30, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
March, 2017
  • March 21, 2017: [Continue]
December, 2016
  • December 12, 2016: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • December 06, 2016: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
  • December 06, 2016: [Docket Annotation]
  • December 05, 2016: [Amend/Correct]
November, 2016
  • November 30, 2016: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • November 30, 2016: [Pretrial Conference]
  • November 30, 2016: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • November 30, 2016: [Pro Hac Vice fee paid(credit card)]
  • November 20, 2016: [Continue]
  • November 01, 2016: [Order]
October, 2016
  • October 21, 2016: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • October 14, 2016: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
September, 2016
  • September 21, 2016: [Trial Order]
  • September 21, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • September 20, 2016: [Continue]
  • September 20, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 09, 2016: [Notice of Calendar Setting]
  • September 08, 2016: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • September 08, 2016: [Digital Audio File]
  • September 07, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • September 07, 2016: [Order Regarding Discovery]
  • September 07, 2016: [Trial Order]
  • September 07, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • September 07, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
  • September 02, 2016: [Notice of Assignment (Probation)]
  • September 01, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 01, 2016: [Order]
  • September 01, 2016: [Waiver]
  • September 01, 2016: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • September 01, 2016: [Unseal Case]
  • September 01, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • September 01, 2016: [Notice of Hearing]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.