U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:15-cr-00001-2
  • Case Name: USA v. Case et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 02, 2025: [Transcript (DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS)]
March, 2025
  • March 24, 2025: [Reduce Sentence - First Step Act]
  • March 24, 2025: [Hearing]
December, 2022
  • December 23, 2022: [Reply to Response]
  • December 16, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • December 12, 2022: [Notice of Conventional Filing]
  • December 12, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal or Restricted]
  • December 09, 2022: [Response in Opposition]
  • December 08, 2022: [Leave to File Document Under Seal or Restricted]
November, 2022
  • November 29, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • November 28, 2022: [Docket Annotation]
  • November 28, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • November 21, 2022: [Order]
  • November 21, 2022: [Compassionate Release (COVID-19)]
May, 2021
  • May 26, 2021: [Order on Motion for Compassionate Release (COVID-19)]
  • May 11, 2021: [Notice of Conventional Filing]
  • May 10, 2021: [Response in Opposition]
  • May 06, 2021: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal or Restricted]
  • May 05, 2021: [Leave to File Document Under Seal or Restricted]
April, 2021
  • April 26, 2021: [Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 26, 2021: [Order]
  • April 22, 2021: [Compassionate Release (COVID-19)]
July, 2020
  • July 02, 2020: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • July 01, 2020: [Withdraw as Attorney]
June, 2020
  • June 29, 2020: [Order on Motion for Compassionate Release (COVID-19)]
  • June 26, 2020: [Reply to Response]
  • June 19, 2020: [Response in Opposition]
  • June 16, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
May, 2020
  • May 27, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 26, 2020: [Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • May 26, 2020: [Order]
  • May 26, 2020: [Compassionate Release (COVID-19)]
February, 2019
  • February 12, 2019: [Docket Annotation]
  • February 12, 2019: [Substitute Attorney]
January, 2019
  • January 11, 2019: [Transcript (DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS)]
November, 2018
  • November 27, 2018: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 27, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
August, 2018
  • August 30, 2018: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • August 30, 2018: [Appoint Counsel]
February, 2018
  • February 01, 2018: [Letter]
September, 2016
  • September 07, 2016: [Satisfaction of Judgment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.